WA SJM8016 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying for a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution relating to fiscal restraints on the federal government, the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and terms of office for federal officials and for members of Congress.
Title
Applying for a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution relating to fiscal restraints on the federal government, the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and terms of office for federal officials and for members of Congress.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HJM4013 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.