WA SJM8015 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Petitioning the President and Secretary of Education to commence proceedings to engage the nation with an awakening dialogue about our education system.
Title
Petitioning the President and Secretary of Education to commence proceedings to engage the nation with an awakening dialogue about our education system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |