WA SJM8011 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that certain portions of state route number 395 be named the "Samuel Grashio Memorial Highway" and the "Thomas S. 'Tom' Foley Memorial Highway."
Title
Requesting that certain portions of state route number 395 be named the "Samuel Grashio Memorial Highway" and the "Thomas S. 'Tom' Foley Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8011&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Joint Memorials/8011-SR 395 highway naming.pdf |