WA SJM8010 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting surplus federal government equipment needed for earthquake and tsunami preparedness.
Title
Requesting surplus federal government equipment needed for earthquake and tsunami preparedness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |