WA SJM8008 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that the United States Department of Labor provide Washington with unemployment tax relief equal to any benefit provided to other states. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Requesting that the United States Department of Labor provide Washington with federal unemployment tax relief for Washington employers and a financial benefit for the state's trust fund. )
Title
Requesting that the United States Department of Labor provide Washington with unemployment tax relief equal to any benefit provided to other states. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Requesting that the United States Department of Labor provide Washington with federal unemployment tax relief for Washington employers and a financial benefit for the state's trust fund. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-12 | Floor amendment | |
2011-04-06 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-30 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-30 | LWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-30 | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-30 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 12:00 PM. | |
2011-03-24 | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. | |
2011-03-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-03-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-18 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-18 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |