WA SJM8002 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting an amendment to the United States Constitution on campaign finance reform.
Title
Requesting an amendment to the United States Constitution on campaign finance reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |