WA SCR8404 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Convening a joint session for the purpose of receiving the address of H.E. Sauli Niinistö, President of the Republic of Finland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convening a joint session for the purpose of receiving the address of H.E. Sauli Niinistö, President of the Republic of Finland.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateFiled with Secretary of State.
2023-02-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-02-28SenatePresident signed.
2023-02-27HouseAdopted; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2023-02-22HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-02-22HouseFirst Reading.
2023-02-20SenateThird reading, adopted.
2023-02-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback