WA SB6851 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the clean water act of 2010 funding cleanup of water pollution and other programs necessary for the health and well-being of Washington citizens through an increase in the tax on hazardous substances.
Title
Concerning the clean water act of 2010 funding cleanup of water pollution and other programs necessary for the health and well-being of Washington citizens through an increase in the tax on hazardous substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-10 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-03-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-09 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3181 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-12 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.