WA SB6849 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Consolidating forecast functions.
Title
Consolidating forecast functions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-04 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-03-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |