WA SB6833 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the management of funds and accounts by the state treasurer.
Title
Addressing the management of funds and accounts by the state treasurer.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 222, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-09 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-09 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-09 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-09 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-03-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-03 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3174 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.