WA SB6826 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing certain fees of licensing subagents. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning fees and listings of licensing subagents. )
Title
Increasing certain fees of licensing subagents. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning fees and listings of licensing subagents. )
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 221, 2010 Laws PV. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3165 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.