WA SB6804 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the department of social and health services to adopt rules establishing standards for the review and certification of treatment facilities under the problem and pathological gambling treatment program.
Title
Allowing the department of social and health services to adopt rules establishing standards for the review and certification of treatment facilities under the problem and pathological gambling treatment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 171, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-10 | House receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2010-02-17 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-29 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3155 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.