WA SB6802 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting a sustainability groundwater policy.
Title
Adopting a sustainability groundwater policy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-04 | EWE - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-29 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6802&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6802.pdf |