WA SB6764 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding accrual of interest on judgments founded on tortious conduct.
Title
Regarding accrual of interest on judgments founded on tortious conduct.
Sponsors
Sen. Randolph I. Gordon [D] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 149, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | President signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-05 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |