WA SB6748 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the business and occupation taxation of newspaper-labeled supplements.
Title
Concerning the business and occupation taxation of newspaper-labeled supplements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-20 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-24 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6748&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6748.pdf |