WA SB6737 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from property tax for aircraft used to provide air ambulance services for nonprofits.
Title
Providing an exemption from property tax for aircraft used to provide air ambulance services for nonprofits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Effective date 7/13/2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Chapter 12, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-03-31 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-24 | President signed. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-22 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-19 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2010-03-19 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-19 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-18 | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-18 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-03-16 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 7. | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-01 | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 2; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-15 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |