WA SB6712 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 7/13/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending expiring tax incentives for certain clean alternative fuel vehicles, producers of certain biofuels, and federal aviation regulation part 145 certificated repair stations.
Title
Extending expiring tax incentives for certain clean alternative fuel vehicles, producers of certain biofuels, and federal aviation regulation part 145 certificated repair stations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Effective date 7/13/2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Chapter 11, 2010 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2010-03-31 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-24 | President signed. | |
2010-03-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-22 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-22 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-18 | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-18 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-03-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-03-16 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 8. | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-09 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-03-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-22 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3053 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.