WA SB6698 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the acquisition of nonprofit hospitals.
Title
Concerning the acquisition of nonprofit hospitals.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Christopher Marr [D] |
Sen. Edward Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-18 | First reading, referred to Rules Review. | |
2010-03-18 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-01 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |