WA SB6696 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding education reform.
Title
Regarding education reform.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-29 | Chapter 235, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-11 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-11 | House receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-23 | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-23 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Education. | |
2010-02-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-11 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |