WA SB6692 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain counties to participate and enter into ownership agreements for electric generating facilities powered by biomass.
Title
Allowing certain counties to participate and enter into ownership agreements for electric generating facilities powered by biomass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-22 | Chapter 167, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-22 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | TEC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 8:30 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | EWE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |