WA SB6688 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning filling vacancies in nonpartisan elective office.
Title
Concerning filling vacancies in nonpartisan elective office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 207, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-19 | SGTA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-19 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-04 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-01 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |