WA SB6658 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying community solar project provisions for investment cost recovery incentives.
Title
Modifying community solar project provisions for investment cost recovery incentives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 202, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-11 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | TEC - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology and Energy & Communications at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | EWE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3104 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.