WA SB6654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that qualified dealer cash incentives paid to auto dealers are bona fide discounts for purposes of the business and occupation tax.
Title
Providing that qualified dealer cash incentives paid to auto dealers are bona fide discounts for purposes of the business and occupation tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2903 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6654&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6654.pdf |