WA SB6613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the inspection of marine aquatic farming locations.
Title
Concerning the inspection of marine aquatic farming locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 216, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |