WA SB6611 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the deadlines for the review and evaluation of comprehensive land use plan and development regulations for three years.
Title
Extending the deadlines for the review and evaluation of comprehensive land use plan and development regulations for three years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 216, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 4; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-10 | House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-22 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-05 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-01 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2992 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.