WA SB6592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tourism authorities.
Title
Concerning tourism authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 215, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-06 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Local Government. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | FIET - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |