WA SB6582 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the criminal history of applicants to institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the criminal history of applicants to institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-15SenateChapter 83, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-15SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-03SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-23HouseHE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Higher Education
2018-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-01SenateOn motion, referred to Rules.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-31SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-31SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 5:45 PM.
2018-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-30SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback