WA SB6582 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning nursing assistant credentialing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning nursing assistant credentialing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-23 Effective date 6/10/2010.
2010-03-23 Chapter 169, 2010 Laws.
2010-03-23 Governor signed.
2010-03-11 Delivered to Governor.
2010-03-11 Speaker signed.
2010-03-10 President signed.
2010-03-09 Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2010-03-09 Senate concurred in House amendments.
2010-02-28 Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2010-02-28 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2010-02-28 Committee amendment adopted as amended.
2010-02-26 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2010-02-24 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2010-02-23 Minority; do not pass.
2010-02-23 HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2010-02-23 HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
2010-02-23 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2010-02-18 Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2010-02-17 First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2010-02-16 Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 1.
2010-02-16 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2010-02-16 Floor amendment
2010-02-16 1st substitute bill substituted
2010-02-12 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2010-02-11 Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
2010-02-05 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2010-02-05 HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2010-02-04 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2010-01-25 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2010-01-18 First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB2766 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback