WA SB6580 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning organ transport vehicles.
Title
Concerning organ transport vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |