WA SB6577 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a statewide child savings account program.
Title
Creating a statewide child savings account program.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2776 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6577&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6577.pdf |