WA SB6571 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for agricultural education students.
Title
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for agricultural education students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |