WA SB6567 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting the oil spill response tax and oil spill administration tax.
Title
Adjusting the oil spill response tax and oil spill administration tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 6:30 PM. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |