WA SB6564 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing incentives to employers to hire certain hard-to-place job seekers.
Title
Providing incentives to employers to hire certain hard-to-place job seekers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |