WA SB6562 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding tuition-setting authority at institutions of higher education.
Title
Regarding tuition-setting authority at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Edward Murray [D] | Sen. Debbie Regala [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-15 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2946 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.