WA SB6554 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an aggravating circumstance for assault against a utility worker.
Title
Providing an aggravating circumstance for assault against a utility worker.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6554&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6554.pdf |