WA SB6538 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining small groups for insurance purposes.
Title
Defining small groups for insurance purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010**. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 292, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-09 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-09 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-09 | House receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments and floor amendment | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |