WA SB6532 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Washington affordable housing tax credit program.
Title
Creating a Washington affordable housing tax credit program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6532&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6532.pdf |