WA SB6531 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the performance of personal services by a craft distillery, distiller, spirits certificate of approval holder, or distributor.
Title
Concerning the performance of personal services by a craft distillery, distiller, spirits certificate of approval holder, or distributor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-25 | House | COG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2800 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.