WA SB6531 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-12)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding the school construction assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding the school construction assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Capital Budget
2018-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-14Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB2953 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-29 - First reading, referred to Capital Budget

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback