WA SB6525 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the state building code council.
Title
Concerning the state building code council.
Sponsors
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2016-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2016-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-02-26 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-24 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 5:45 PM. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |