WA SB6518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing prenatal exposure and harm to children by limiting environmental exposure to certain pesticides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing prenatal exposure and harm to children by limiting environmental exposure to certain pesticides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03SenateGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 1; excused, 1.
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2020-03-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-28HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-17Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-06SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6518&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6518.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6518-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6518-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6518-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6518-S2.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121784&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6518&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121784&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6518&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121784&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6518&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback