WA SB6515 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a pilot program that provides incentives for investments in Washington state job creation and economic development.
Title
Creating a pilot program that provides incentives for investments in Washington state job creation and economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass TRED 14 bill proposed by Trade & Economic Development. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 9:00 AM. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |