WA SB6513 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the use of deepfake audio or visual media in campaigns for elective office.
Title
Restricting the use of deepfake audio or visual media in campaigns for elective office.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 11:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |