WA SB6504 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that facilities that are operated by a private entity in which persons are detained in custody under process of law pending the outcome of legal proceedings are not essential public facilities under the growth management act.
Title
Clarifying that facilities that are operated by a private entity in which persons are detained in custody under process of law pending the outcome of legal proceedings are not essential public facilities under the growth management act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2640 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6504&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6504.pdf |