WA SB6504 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing crime victims' compensation benefits and eligibility.
Title
Reducing crime victims' compensation benefits and eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date 6/10/2010*. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 122, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-11 | President signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-10 | Held on second reading. | |
2010-03-10 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-03-10 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-03-10 | House receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-10 | Senate insists on its position and asks House to recede. | |
2010-03-10 | Senate refuses to concur in the House amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-23 | PSEP - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-23 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-13 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-09 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-05 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-05 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2770 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.