WA SB6495 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a temporary teen training wage.
Title
Establishing a temporary teen training wage.
Sponsors
Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] |
Sen. John Braun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Executive session in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6495&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6495.pdf |