WA SB6486 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding registered apprenticeship programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding registered apprenticeship programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM.
2018-02-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-23HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-23HouseHE - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-21HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Higher Education
2018-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-13SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-31SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-31SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 5:45 PM.
2018-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback