WA SB6485 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving access to mental health services for children and youth.
Title
Improving access to mental health services for children and youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2779 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.