WA SB6481 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying which local governments have jurisdiction over conversion-related forest practices.
Title
Clarifying which local governments have jurisdiction over conversion-related forest practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Harry Morton [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 219, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2010-03-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-19 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | NROR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |