WA SB6474 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a pilot project for tribal compact schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a pilot project for tribal compact schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-27SenateChapter 290, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01HouseFloor amendment
2018-03-01HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2018-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-22HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Education
2018-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-05SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2018-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-01SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-01SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback